Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Community Patrols Of New Zealand Charitable Trust
CPNZ
CC31245
9429042982807
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 3017
Wellington
6140
Level 2
180 Molesworth Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

021929505


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To help prevent crime in our communities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Community Protection), Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Other (please state)

(Crime Prevention), Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 10/02/2025 $598,612 $553,101 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 9/02/2024 $761,788 $485,952 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 27/11/2022 $395,243 $360,111 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 1/12/2021 $484,222 $521,822 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 24/12/2020 $485,616 $422,607 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 23/12/2019 $491,132 $558,281 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 28/02/2019 4/02/2019 $531,181 $615,290 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 10/04/2018 $681,750 $474,041 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 26/05/2017 $550,955 $566,984 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 20/04/2016 $578,610 $596,575 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kathy Anne Wright Trustee 18/03/2024
Gurdeep Talwar Trustee 10/10/2022
Sheree Lana Mason Trustee 29/01/2020
Lyndsey Jacobs Trustee 24/06/2017
Christopher Michael Lawton Trustee 17/04/2009
Robert John Fowler Trustee 24/03/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Martin Florence Price Trustee 2/10/2023
Carol Anne Dickson Trustee 17/12/2021
James Netley Searle Trustee 31/07/2021
Carol Dickson Trustee 12/04/2017
Teena Maree Cornes Trustee 2/01/2017
Trevor George Hopkins Trustee 19/03/2014
David James Merrall Trustee 8/11/2013
Alan Simpson Treasurer 8/02/2013
Ian James Pilbrow Trustee 31/03/2010
Michael Gill Trustee 31/01/2009
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/11/2022 NOC025
16/12/2021 NOC024
18/11/2021 NOC022
13/08/2021 NOC021
24/12/2019 NOC019
10/06/2019 NOC017
18/02/2019 NOC016
23/01/2017 NOC012
12/07/2016 NOC011
12/07/2016 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.