pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland City Triathlon Club Incorporated
CC47275
9429042588023
Registered

Registration details

24/01/2012
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 99079
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
8-12 Tamaki Drive
Orakei
Auckland
1071

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/AkldCityTri


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To engage in, promote, sponsor, develop and encourage multisports which include any two or more disciplines of swimming, cycling and running. To foster competition and championships of any two or more of the disciplines referred to. To promote coaching, training and club house facilities for the benefit of the local community. To use the funds of the Club in such a manner as may be considered necessary or proper in carrying out the objects of the Club.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(To promote coaching, training and club house facilities for the benefit of the local community)

Sport / recreation

General public

Children / young people, Sports orientated people - both young and old

Entity Structure

Not-for-profit organisation governed by its committee members. The management of the Club shall be undertaken by the Executive Committee, comprising of a President, a Vice Presidents, Secretary, Treasurer and five spokespersons.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 31/12/2017 $25,930 $37,339
31/12/2016 31/01/2017 $35,343 $23,414
31/12/2015 9/11/2015 $35,026 $26,289
31/12/2014 24/10/2014 $13,938 $12,770
31/12/2013 19/12/2013 $17,082 $18,326
31/12/2012 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nicola Sproule Committee Member 27/10/2016
Patricia Carden Treasurer 27/10/2016
Tom Gethin Secretary 27/10/2016
Tracey Livingstone Committee Member 27/10/2016
Sacha Cowlrick President 13/09/2014
Francesca Stafford Vice President 19/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Helene Browne Treasurer 27/10/2016
Lynley Rhonda Twyman President 27/10/2016
Scott Burridge Committee Member 27/10/2016
Tony O'Hagan Committee Member 27/10/2016
Anna Wills Committee Member 31/10/2015
Anna Wills Secretary 31/10/2015
Darragh Walshe Secretary 31/10/2015
Dreydon Sobanja Committee Member 31/10/2015
Stuart Ross Committee Member 31/10/2015
Gordon Gillan Committee Member 12/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/11/2016 NOC006
3/11/2016 NOC005
7/04/2015 NOC004
24/10/2014 NOC003
24/10/2014 NOC002
19/12/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents