Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tātaki Auckland Unlimited Trust
CC45674
N/A
Registered

Registration details

15/10/2010
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Regional Facilities Auckland 15/10/2010
Tātaki Auckland Unlimited Trust 13/05/2022

Address for service

PO Box 5749
Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142
48-52 Mayoral Drive
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

09-309 2677


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide arts, environment, sport and events to Auckland community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provision of arts, environment, sport and events to Auckland community)

Community development

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Animals, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 2/12/2024 $183,677,000 $188,488,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/12/2023 $358,503,000 $187,133,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 28/02/2023 $142,470,000 $140,856,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 17/11/2021 $151,229,000 $132,413,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 5/11/2020 $174,722,000 $152,531,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 11/12/2019 $183,933,000 $130,212,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/10/2018 $142,653,000 $125,929,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 4/10/2018 $118,352,000 $116,866,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 11/04/2017 $131,517,000 $112,259,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 10/04/2017 $108,665,000 $131,030,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Victoria Jane Salmon Trustee Director (Chair) 1/04/2023
Graeme Edward Stephens Trustee Director 1/11/2022
Alastair Kinlock Carruthers Trustee Director 1/07/2021
Te Hinurewa Ngahiwa Tame Kawae Te Hau Trustee Director 1/07/2021
Daniel Te Whenua Walker Trustee Director 14/09/2020
Hongyu Cheng Trustee Director 14/09/2020
Jennah Wootten Trustee Director (Deputy Chair) 1/11/2019
Tātaki Auckland Unlimited Limited Trustee 14/10/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/05/2022 NOC012
25/03/2022 NOC011
9/03/2020 NOC007
15/11/2013 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.