pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rotary District 9940 Wellington Regional Children's Health Fund Charitable Trust
Rotary Children's Health Trust
CC58918
N/A
Registered

Registration details

24/03/2021
March 31

Address for service

20 James Cook Drive
Whitby
Porirua
5024

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Raise funds to support the improvement of children's health in the lower part of the North Island, and upper south Island. This is the area the new Wellington Children's Hospital will cover. The trust is initially working with the Wellington Hospital's Trust to contribute funding for the new Children's Hospital in Wellington.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Health

Emergency / disaster relief

General public

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Under the umbrella of Rotary District 9940, a Trust of 4 members and a small planning team to support clubs in the area to raise funds

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2021 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 - - - - Exempt

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adrienne Patricia Murray Chair 20/07/2020
Carol Elsa Green Secretary 20/07/2020
John Heremia Mohi Director 20/07/2020
Stephen Paul Lace Treasurer 20/07/2020

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents