pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The McGuinness Foundation Trust
CC10457
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The New Zealand Sustainable Future Foundation Trust 15/06/2007
The McGuinness Foundation Trust 22/02/2012

Registration details

15/06/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 24222
Manners Street
Wellington
6142
LEVEL 2
5 Cable Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 499 8888
04 385 9884

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To distribute donations in accordance with the strategic objectives set by the Trustees

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Economic development

General public

Entity Structure

Trustees consisting of two members

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
McGuinness Institute Limited CC21440

Annual Returns


Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
- 31/03/2017 - - - -
3/10/2016 31/03/2016 $0 $0
17/07/2015 31/03/2015 $0 $0
29/09/2014 31/03/2014 $0 $0
21/10/2013 31/03/2013 $0 $0
28/09/2012 31/03/2012 $0 $0
28/09/2011 31/03/2011 $0 $0
15/09/2010 31/03/2010 $0 $0
19/08/2009 31/03/2009 $0 $0
22/07/2009 31/03/2008 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Daniel McGuinness Trustee 4/04/2007
Wendy Louise McGuinness Trustee 4/04/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/03/2012 NOC003
22/07/2009 NOC002
22/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents