pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
CC40144
9429032538540
Registered

Registration details

18/05/2009
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
SDAC South Pacific Charitable Fund Limited 19/05/2009
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted 14/03/2012

Address for service

124 Pah Road
Royal Oak
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details

612 9847 3333
612 9489 0943


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Production and distribution of healthy foods, promotion of a healthy lifestyle and the support of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research, Religious activities

General public

Other charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 9/12/2011 $0 $0
31/12/2010 25/01/2011 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graeme Drinkall Director 1/01/2016
Kevin Allan Jackson Director 31/10/2008
Rodney Graeme Brady Director 31/10/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Barry David Oliver Director 1/01/2017
Julie Gay Judd Director 1/01/2017
Ronald Douglas William Davidson Director 2/10/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/01/2014 NOC004
10/04/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents