Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Movement
CC50388
9429043207459
Registered

Registration details

31/03/2014
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Auckland Harbour Bridge Pathway 31/03/2014
SkyPath 1/03/2016
Movement 25/02/2020

Address for service

355 Foster Road
RD 1
Waimauku
Kumeu
0891

Charity's other details

0211226040


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. To provide walking and cycling access across the Auckland Harbour Bridge for the benefit of the public. 2. To support the improvement of walking and cycling in Aotearoa. 3. To give grants to promote walking and cycling in Aotearoa as funding allows. 4. To take such actions as the Board constituted herein consider necessary to further the above aims and objectives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Health, Sport / recreation

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 10/10/2024 $8,390 $20,930 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 26/10/2023 $16,452 $84,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $10,810 $36,169 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 26/09/2021 $99,705 $1,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 14/06/2020 $1,274,120 $1,259,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 5/10/2019 $14,625 $7,511 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 11/04/2018 $30,373 $31,183 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 23/05/2017 $30,172 $40,753 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 14/04/2016 $48,982 $36,010 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tim Jones Trustee 27/09/2021
Bevan Gary Reid Woodward Trustee 28/04/2010
Christine Anne Rose Trustee 28/04/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew John Smith Trustee 17/07/2021
Alex Gordon Swney Trustee 9/10/2014
Kirsten Shouler Trustee 25/08/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/11/2021 NOC013
27/09/2021 NOC012
25/02/2020 NOC009
1/03/2016 NOC004
10/01/2015 NOC003
19/12/2014 NOC002
7/11/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.