pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited
CC42029
9429035446811
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 94200
Howick
Auckland
2145
LEVEL 1
18 Fencible Drive
Howick
Auckland
2014

Charity's other details

09 250 1770
09 533 0581


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Holds the title for beneficial owners of entities of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben Timothy Director 1/08/2018
Francois Keet Director 1/06/2017
Michael Sikuri Director 30/10/2016
John Stilinovic Director 1/01/2012
Graeme Lindan Drinkall Trustee 25/01/2010
Edward Tupai Director 31/10/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bradley Kemp Director 27/07/2018
Kelvin J Peuser Trustee 31/12/2016
Damien Rice Director 29/10/2016
Jerome Paul Matthews Director 27/07/2013
Craig Andrew Gillis Director 30/04/2012
Rodney Graeme Brady Director 31/12/2011
Ronald Leslie Herbert Director 31/12/2011
Peter Charles Lynch Director 25/01/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/10/2019 NOC011
29/10/2018 NOC009
12/12/2016 NOC005
2/10/2013 NOC004
27/04/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42023) on 12 December 2016.