pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
NZPUC
CC42018
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 94200
Howick
Auckland
2145
LEVEL 1
18 Fencible Drive
Howick
Auckland
2014

Charity's other details

09 250 1770
09 533 0581

Oceania

Australia


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Religious Organisation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, International activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Edward Tupai President 27/07/2018
Graeme Lindan Drinkall Chief Financial Officer 25/01/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Jones Assistant Chief Financial Officer 31/12/2018
Bradley Kemp President 28/07/2018
Jerome Paul Matthews Chairperson 27/07/2013
Kendell Vance Cobbin Committee Member 31/12/2010
Togamau Tuaoi Committee Member 31/12/2010
Owen Ellis Committee Member 30/04/2010
Peter Charles Lynch Secretary 25/01/2010
Emile Maxi Committee Member 31/12/2007
Edward Tupai Committee Member 30/10/2005

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/10/2018 NOC013
12/12/2016 NOC009
25/10/2016 NOC008
10/09/2013 NOC007
10/09/2013 NOC006
29/01/2013 NOC005
8/03/2012 NOC004
26/04/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42023) on 12 December 2016.