pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
CC42120
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 74200
Howick
Auckland
2145
Fencible House
18 Fencible Drive
Howick
Auckland
2014

Charity's other details

09 250 1770
09 533 0581


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Religious Organisation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Religious groups

Other charities

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2010 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Glenn Townend Chairperson 1/01/2017
Lionel Smith Committee Member 13/11/2013
Graeme Lindan Drinkall Committee Member 15/11/2012
John Stilinovic Secretary 16/01/2012
Edward Tupai Committee Member 24/11/2005
Rodney Graeme Brady Chief Financial Officer 1/01/1999

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bradley Richard Kemp Committee Member 31/07/2018
Barry David Oliver Chairperson 1/01/2017
Jerome Paul Matthews Committee Member 13/11/2013
Lawrence Tanabose General Secretary 13/11/2013
Craig Andrew Gillis Committee Member 15/11/2012
Kelvin John Peuser Committee Member 15/11/2012
Ronald Leslie Herbert Committee Member 31/01/2012
John Stilinovic Secretary 16/01/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/01/2014 NOC005
16/01/2012 NOC004
16/01/2012 NOC003
16/01/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents