Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Theosophical Society In New Zealand Incorporated
CC23303
9429042893240
Registered

Registration details

21/04/2008
September 30

Address for service

18 Belvedere Street
Epsom
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

(09)5231797
https://www.facebook.com/TheosophyNZ/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Theosophical Society In New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
The Theosophical Society In New Zealand Inc Trust
The Theosophical Society In New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

As an education based organisation our Mission is to serve humanity by cultivating an ever deepening understanding and realization of the Ageless Wisdom, spiritual self-transformation, and the Unity of all Life.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Spiritual education and the body supports theosophical centres in NZ)

Education / training / research

Religious activities

Other (please state)

(People on their spiritual/religious journey)

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Helen Sussmilch Governance Board member 17/01/2025
Johannes Jacobus Cornelis Vorstermans Board member 12/01/2024
Susan Alice Kaschula Board member 12/01/2024
Toni Deborah Weir Board Member 12/01/2024
Kirsten Morton governance board member 13/01/2023
Paul Stanley Henderson governance board member 13/01/2023
Melanie Closs Governance Board member 13/01/2017
Richard Sell Governance Board member 3/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Victoria Jerome Governance Board member 17/01/2025
Christine Hensley Governance Board member 12/01/2024
Graham Eden Governance Board member 12/01/2024
Johannes Jacobus Vorstermans National President 13/01/2023
Renee Sell National Vice President 13/01/2023
Simon James Webber Governance Board 13/01/2023
Marshall Richard Hope Governance Board member 14/01/2022
Julia Tarnawsky Governance Board member 8/01/2021
Warwick Keys Governance Board member 17/01/2020
Graham Courtney Eded Treasurer 18/01/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/05/2025 NOC036
3/03/2023 NOC030
26/04/2022 NOC027
26/04/2022 NOC026
2/03/2022 NOC025
18/03/2021 NOC023
10/03/2020 NOC020
23/04/2019 NOC019
28/06/2017 NOC016
20/07/2015 NOC014
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.