Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust
CC38560
9429042687498
Deregistered
16/04/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.

Below are details of Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 16/04/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 914
Nelson
7040
72 Trafalgar Street
Nelson
7010

Charity's other details

(03)548 1740


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Religious activities, Relief of poverty

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2016 31/03/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2014 31/03/2015 2/04/2015 $491,003 $402,038 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2013 31/03/2014 Member of 'Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2012 31/03/2013 Member of 'Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2011 31/03/2012 Member of 'Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2010 31/03/2011 Member of 'Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kelvin Tapuke Trustee 21/04/2013
Margaret Little Trustee 22/04/2012
Joanne Westrupp Kaihautu 1/04/2012
David John Rollston Trust Secretary 25/02/2012
Anthony Paul Little Trustee 21/08/2010
Andrew David Stephens Trustee 30/06/2008
Frederick Te Miha Trustee 30/06/2008
Hinga Ellen Te Miha Trustee 30/06/2008
John Tahana Ward-Holmes Trustee 30/06/2008
Judith M Billens Trustee 30/06/2008
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mirangi Reiher Trustee 21/04/2013
Hemingamoana Ropata Trustee 22/04/2012
Phillip C Sparks Trustee 21/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/05/2013 NOC005
14/03/2013 NOC004
20/07/2012 NOC003
29/10/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.