Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Wellington City Mission Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
The Wellington City Mission (Anglican) Trust Board

Group Details


Wellington City Mission Group
Wellington City Mission

Registration details

Registered
12/03/2008
CC21777
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 7477
Newtown
Wellington
6242
4 Oxford Terrace
Mount Cook
Wellington
6021

Group's other details

04 245 0900


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 27/09/2024 $33,905,000 $24,324,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $29,597,000 $17,802,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 18/10/2022 $21,673,000 $14,703,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $18,975,000 $12,649,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 2/10/2020 $9,634,000 $9,655,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 1/08/2019 $8,338,000 $7,413,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 12/09/2018 $7,389,899 $7,172,680 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 25/07/2017 $6,813,306 $7,026,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/08/2016 $6,449,663 $6,494,534 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Wellington City Mission is a charitable trust affiliated to the Anglican Church. The Mission prides itself on being open to anyone who needs assistance - regardless of their religious belief, age, ethnicity, or social background. Our Mission programmes assist a range of people living in Greater Wellington communities. The Mission also operates transitional housing facilities and an elder-care residential facility (Kemp Home and Hospital)

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Wellington City Mission (Anglican Trust Board has one subsidiary company, Mission Residential Care Ltd.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/07/2008 AR002

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.