Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Cyberwaka Limited
CC40637
9429036268214
Registered

Registration details

7/06/2009
June 30

Address for service

R D 3
State Highway 35
Te Kaha
Opotiki
3199
102 St John Street
Opotiki
3122

Charity's other details

07 3252726
07 3252739


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Runanga o Te Whanau Charitable Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Cyberwaka Limited
Te Runanga O Te Whanau
TWA Fishing Company Limited
TWA Health and Social Services Limited
TWA Holding Company Limited
TWA Holiday Park Limited
TWA Resort Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Reduce digital divide within our rural community in support of parent entity's vision and mission.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(IT support and networking/ manages IT support & networking in support of parent entity)

Social services

Economic development

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

100% subsidiary company of Te Whanau a Apanui Iwi Trust (Te Runanga o Te Whanau) with two directors, and 2 staff.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Matetu Matt Herewini Director 10/09/2015
Riki Gage Director 18/02/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/10/2016 NOC002
8/10/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.