Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Parkinsonism Society of New Zealand Incorporated
Parkinsons New Zealand, Parkinsons Society
CC27357
9429042787167
Deregistered
29/06/2018

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of The Parkinsonism Society of New Zealand Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 11067
Manners Street
Wellington
6142
Level 7, Education House (West Block)
178-182 Willis Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 801 8850
04 801 8336


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Parkinson's New Zealand provides support, education and information for the New Zealanders living with Parkinson's, their families, carers and health professionals.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Health Professionals

Entity Structure

We are an Incorporated Society, governed by a Board of elected members with a National Office, two branches and 13 divisions.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 Member of 'Parkinson's New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 Member of 'Parkinson's New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 29/06/2016 $1,228,823 $1,300,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 25/06/2015 $1,326,855 $1,210,280 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 24/06/2014 $1,018,145 $1,179,753 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 9/07/2013 $482,255 $563,353 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 25/06/2012 $620,000 $686,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 29/04/2011 $731,813 $588,304 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2009 30/06/2010 24/06/2010 $635,360 $577,581 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2008 30/06/2009 27/05/2009 $510,530 $510,817 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brian Brooks Board Member 27/05/2017
Graeme Roberts Board Member 9/04/2016
Kathy Jenkins President 9/04/2016
Janice Grigg Board Member 17/04/2015
Judy Clarke Board Member 17/04/2015
Susan Abraham Board Member 17/04/2015
Andrew Scott Dunn Board Member 6/04/2013
Hugh Kirby Taylor Board Member 6/04/2013
Murray Carey Chairperson 6/04/2013
David Bailey Staff 1/01/2012
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lloyd Jenkins Board Member 12/12/2016
Michael Lynch President 9/04/2016
Dilys Parker Board Member 6/10/2015
Garry Frater Board Member 17/04/2015
Gordon Hancock Board Member 17/04/2015
Michael Sinclair Board Member 17/04/2015
Judi Weir Board Member 11/04/2014
Katherine Jenkins Board Member 11/04/2014
Fiona Mathieson Vice Chairperson 6/04/2013
Florence Leota Board Member 6/04/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/05/2017 NOC016
15/07/2016 NOC014
4/07/2016 NOC013
29/06/2016 NOC012
18/04/2016 NOC011
25/06/2015 NOC010
1/12/2014 NOC009
30/06/2014 NOC008
9/07/2013 AR006
25/06/2012 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.