Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Central Region Localities Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Latitude Health Limited
Tū Ora Compass Health

Group Details


Central Region Localities Group

Registration details

Registered
1/10/2021
CC59467
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 27380
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
Level 4
22-28 Willeston Street
Wellington
6011

Group's other details

04 801 7808


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 18/12/2024 $136,891,310 $136,146,617 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 20/02/2024 $133,484,031 $133,549,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 12/12/2022 $162,650,708 $153,933,052 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 17/12/2021 $117,120,272 $116,219,603 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing community-based health services to the Wellington and Wairarapa regions

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

General public

Entity Structure

The parent company - Tū Ora Compass Health is a Primary Health Organisation which supports General Practices in the Greater Wellington Region. The Head Office is based in Wellington CBD and there are offices in Porirua, Masterton and a satellite office in Kapiti. Latitude Health Limited is 100% owned by Tū Ora Compass Health and is the investment arm of the Group. Latitude has taken up various interests in medical practices to enable them to continue operating when owner GPs retire.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.