Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Chinese Christian Church of Auckland
CC51613
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/04/2015
June 30

Address for service

25 Union Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ahuriri Putorino Presbyterian Church
Albany Presbyterian Church
Alpine Presbytery
Atua Awhi Community Charitable Trust
Auckland Chinese Presbyterian Church
Auckland Taiwanese Presbyterian Church
Balclutha Presbyterian Parish
Banks Peninsula Presbyterian Church
Belmont Presbyterian Church St. Margaret's
The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

ACPC believes it is called by God to work with others in making Jesus Christ known through:- * Proclaiming the gospel * Caring for God's creation * Teaching & nurturing people in Christian faith * Loving service responding to human needs * Seeking to transform society

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

general public

Entity Structure

ACPC is one of 273 churches affiliated to the Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa .New Zealand (PCANZ). It is guided by the provisions of the PCANZ Book of Order. However it is autonomous and its governance is the responsibility of a church council elected by its members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'The Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 5/10/2020 $1,107,754 $876,684 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 15/10/2019 $318,347 $278,986 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 23/11/2018 $283,244 $267,369 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 3/12/2017 $236,981 $218,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 25/09/2016 $217,425 $195,034 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/01/2016 $233,257 $229,574 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Coby Lin Parish Councillor 31/10/2021
Ida Tang Treasurer 14/05/2021
Daniel Alexander Parish Councillor 1/10/2020
Robert O'Callahan Parish Councillor 1/10/2019
Martin Bing Parish Councillor 18/09/2016
Lydia Lam Parish Councillor 27/09/2015
Tony Wai Parish Councillor 27/09/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Edith Poon Parish Councillor 31/10/2021
Colby Lin Parish Councillor 1/10/2021
Jonathon Yu Parish Councillor 1/10/2021
Celia Wong Parish Councillor 1/10/2020
Kam Fan Tomg Parish Councillor 31/07/2019
Emily Ko treasurer 18/09/2016
Jean Wong Session Clerk 18/09/2016
Pak Hong Ko ruling elder 18/09/2016
Robert Weeks O'Callahan ruling elder 18/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/02/2022 NOC013
27/11/2021 NOC012
27/11/2021 NOC011
14/05/2021 NOC010
5/10/2020 NOC008
18/09/2016 NOC002
21/01/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.