Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Coastguard Maraetai Incorporated
CC34194
9429043109371
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 18
Beachlands
Auckland
2147
213 Maraetai Drive
Maraetai
Auckland
2018

Charity's other details

09 536 7105


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF COASTGUARD MARAETAI INC Coastguard Maraetai Inc. is an incorporated society whose stated aims are: a)            The operation of a marine search and rescue service; b)            The prevention of death, injury or accident at sea; c)            The provision of water safety education; d)            The provision of boatmaster/seamanship education and training; e)            The provision of first aid education and training; f)             Such other charitable purposes associated with enhancing and protecting the public’s use and enjoyment of the marine environment; and g)            To do all such other lawful acts and things as are incidental or conducive to the attainment of the charitable purposes of the CNR.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Sea Rescue)

Other (please state)

(Sea Rescue), Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief

General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society is governed by an executive committee who oversee the operations and manage volunteers. Our 34 volunteers man the rescue craft in three crews. We are able to mount a crew 24 hours per day, 7 days a week to attend any call for assistance. There are a number of DOC parks in our area and we provide a service to park users and swimmers at our beautiful beaches
Royal New Zealand Coastguard Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 23/11/2024 $210,003 $191,666 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 8/01/2024 $280,322 $154,182 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 19/12/2022 $210,278 $118,982 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 29/12/2021 $216,615 $108,751 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 6/01/2021 $178,801 $100,809 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 24/11/2019 $350,838 $176,821 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 20/11/2018 $170,053 $108,724 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 19/11/2017 $153,820 $114,533 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $151,532 $128,954 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 25/02/2016 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Laura Jane Sinclair Unit Safety Officer 17/10/2023
Annie Lee Secretary 10/10/2023
Gary Copestake President 10/10/2023
Zharna Marie Welch Treasurer 10/10/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gary Copestake Unit Safety Officer 17/10/2023
Laura Jane Sinclair Treasurer 10/10/2023
Paula Ruth Pioch Secretary 10/10/2023
Trent Robert Dixon President 10/10/2023
Robyn Andrea Chapman Treasurer 16/10/2022
Pamela Wilson President 12/10/2021
Allan Frederick Clarke Treasurer 11/10/2021
Christine Maslowski Vice President 1/07/2020
Laurent Pioch Registered Member 1/07/2020
Tony Harold Registered Member 1/07/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/06/2023 NOC032
13/08/2020 NOC028
1/08/2020 NOC027
3/07/2019 NOC025
11/08/2018 NOC023
6/11/2016 NOC019
11/09/2015 NOC018
15/03/2015 NOC017
22/12/2014 NOC016
22/12/2014 NOC015
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.