Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Families For Life Trust
CC33149
9429042941996
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

81 Bickerton Street
Wainoni
Christchurch
8061

Charity's other details

03 373 8032


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Celebration Centre Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Celebration Centre Trust
CS Benefits Property Trust
Deep Waters Trust
Families For Life Trust
Lions Community Sports & Education Trust
Metro Youth Trust
PTL Property Trust
The Gateway Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. Educational Institutions including Early Childhood Centres, Pre-Schools and After school Programmes 2. Facilities for care of children including pre-school children and those in need of special care 3. Provide leadership direction and educational needs of the people of its local community 4. Establish such service centres, programmes and facilities as will enable the Trustees to provide appropriate comunity social services 5. Alleviate the difficulties of those experiencing hardships of whatever kind, including financial hardship and to bring relief through whatever means are available 6. Carrying out such other charitable purposes within New Zealand as the Trustees shall determine

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Social services, Religious activities

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'Celebration Centre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 Member of 'Celebration Centre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 Member of 'Celebration Centre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 Member of 'Celebration Centre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 30/09/2021 Member of 'Celebration Centre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 Member of 'Celebration Centre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 Member of 'Celebration Centre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 30/09/2018 13/08/2018 $1,963,247 $1,790,653 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 14/09/2017 $1,803,258 $1,617,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 29/09/2016 $1,653,780 $1,579,145 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
1 2>
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gregg Richard Le Roux Trustee 6/10/2014
Kelly Watkinson Trustee 27/07/2010
Kerry Rutherford Trustee 27/07/2010
Melanie Justine Watkinson Trustee 27/07/2010
Murray John Watkinson Trustee 30/07/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bob Hamilton Trustee 1/01/2015
Corey Murray Watkinson Trustee 11/11/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/04/2025 NOC017
4/11/2015 NOC007
10/08/2010 NOC003
6/08/2010 AR004
24/06/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.