Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Philips Search & Rescue Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Helicopter Leasing New Zealand Limited
Philips Search and Rescue Trust

Group Details


Philips Search & Rescue Group

Registration details

Registered
28/07/2009
CC41579
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 1870
Taupo
3351
87 Tauhara Road
Taupo 3330
Tauhara
Taupō
3330

Group's other details

0274 903 089


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 4/10/2024 $20,260,880 $18,687,046 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 22/03/2024 23/03/2024 $19,566,009 $18,344,108 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/01/2023 8/02/2023 $19,348,144 $19,091,332 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 7/11/2022 5/11/2022 $18,523,355 $17,934,513 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 8/10/2021 $15,680,508 $15,504,788 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/11/2019 8/10/2021 $16,603,871 $15,224,077 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 19/03/2019 $13,992,033 $11,588,987 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/11/2017 $12,312,272 $10,960,099 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/11/2016 $12,176,894 $11,078,552 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
1 2>
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To Provide Air Rescue and Air Ambulance Services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Air Search and Rescue

Emergency / disaster relief

Air Ambulance

General public

Entity Structure

Group comprising two controlled entities

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.