Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
CC24673
9429043173440
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

55 Talbot Street
Whanganui East
Whanganui
4500

Charity's other details

021 131 6745


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To work together with families, all medical professionals and local authorities to ensure ostomates and persons with related surgeries of every age and cultural background in the Wanganui Health Board area receive free of charge, the best care and equipment that will enable them to lead normal lives of optimum quality.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, People of all ages

Entity Structure

Members of the Wanganui Society Incorporated elect President, 0r this year a President/ Secretary, Treasurer and a committee of up to four financial members to manage the society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 14/10/2024 $844 $1,197 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 19/03/2024 $1,662 $1,060 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 26/08/2022 $602 $1,252 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 20/08/2022 $602 $1,252 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 8/07/2020 $826 $1,055 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 8/08/2019 $2,272 $1,004 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 21/08/2018 $2,528 $1,478 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 5/10/2017 $3,261 $1,480 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 22/09/2016 $1,934 $1,624 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Raewyn Haworth Committee 30/05/2024
Frances Ngarie Wylie Treasurer 30/04/2019
Allison Furlong Committee 15/08/2018
Maureen Gleeson Committee 18/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Ronald Gunn Committee member 30/05/2024
Trevor Douglas Sammons President/Secretary 30/05/2024
Alison Metcalf Committee 15/06/2023
Janet O'Neill President 2/05/2022
Brian Rex Winter Committee 31/03/2021
David McCall Vice president 31/03/2021
John Cuitanovich Committee Member 31/03/2021
Lesley Dawn George Committee 31/03/2021
Marion davenport Secretary 31/03/2021
John Edmond O'Neill Treasurer 18/06/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/10/2024 NOC020
4/08/2022 NOC015
7/06/2013 AR006
5/06/2012 AR005
28/06/2010 AR003
5/06/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.