pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kia Haumaru - Personal Safety Education Incorporated
Women's Self Defence Network - Wahine Toa
CC25841
9429042924203
Registered

Registration details

12/06/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Women's Self Defence Network - Wahine Toa Incorporated 13/06/2008
Kia Haumaru - Personal Safety Education Incorporated 4/12/2020

Address for service

PO Box 24090
Manners Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6142
Level 1
4 Bond Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 213 9710


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The prevention and early intervention of all forms of violence and abuse against women and girls, including sexual violence, family violence, intimate partner violence and child abuse.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Women. Girls and persons of marginalised genders)

Entity Structure

Membership-based Incorporated Society with an elected board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 Decemmber 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 25/01/2022 $580,898 $719,552
31/12/2020 28/12/2020 $512,264 $595,108
31/12/2019 18/12/2019 $657,841 $639,824
31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $783,860 $585,645
31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $619,138 $580,306
31/12/2016 19/12/2016 $406,334 $490,290
31/12/2015 30/12/2015 $515,298 $549,947
31/12/2014 12/03/2015 $846,245 $571,232
31/12/2013 28/01/2014 $503,230 $596,887

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Julie-Anne Reilly Board Member 27/11/2021
Brienne Sergeant Board Member 13/10/2021
Rebecca Amundsen Board Member 13/10/2021
Judith Browne Board Member 25/09/2021
Annette Tupaea Co-Chair Board Member 15/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lani Rota Board Member 21/01/2022
Bev Thomas Board member 25/09/2021
Helena Cody Board Member 25/09/2021
Christine Prattley Board Member 12/07/2021
Jaine Cronin Board Member 12/07/2021
Christine Vogel-Prattley Tauiwi Caucus Co-Chair 31/08/2020
Judith Browne Maori Caucus Co-Chair 6/06/2020
Bee Bian Ong Chandra Board Member 1/05/2020
Julie Goldingham Board member 2/02/2020
Lorraine Moir Board Member 15/09/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/01/2022 NOC034
13/10/2021 NOC032
13/10/2021 NOC031
3/09/2021 NOC030
29/12/2020 NOC028
24/09/2020 NOC027
31/08/2020 NOC026
28/08/2020 NOC025
30/07/2020 NOC024
2/10/2018 NOC021

Charity Documents