Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Kāhui Raraunga Charitable Trust
Te Kāhui Raraunga
CC57654
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/11/2019
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1069
Rotorua
3040
1172 Haupapa Street
Rotorua 3010
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Enhance the social, cultural, environmental, and economic well-being of Māori. Enable iwi, hapū and whānau Māori to access, collect and use Māori data to measure and identify areas of Māori well-being requiring change. Support innovation and research that advances the use of Māori data. Educate Māori on the benefits of collection and use of Māori data. Promote and advance opportunities for iwi, hapū and whānau Māori to share knowledge and information relating to collection and use of Māori data.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development

General public

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 10/03/2025 10/03/2025 $7,115,793 $6,729,071 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/12/2023 $10,741,580 $9,530,585 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2023 $3,551,653 $3,246,976 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2022 $1,981,837 $1,990,504 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 1/01/2021 $1,490,436 $338,375 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Liana Huia Poutu Trustee 26/02/2024
Rahui Papa Trustee 1/10/2021
Rikirangi Gage Trustee 30/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karen Vercoe Trustee 31/03/2024
Che Wilson Trustee 29/11/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/05/2024 NOC007

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.