pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of St John.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Kaikoura St. John Foundation Trust
Order of St John Great Barrier Island
St John Alexandra Area Committee
St John Ambulance Financial Control Board - Timaru
St John Amuri Area Committee
St John Banks Peninsula Area Committee
St John Bay Of Islands Area Committee
St John Benneydale Area Committee
St John Bream Bay (Marsden) Area Committee
The Priory In New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem

Group Details


St John

Registration details

Registered
30/06/2008
CC35255
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 14902
Panmure
Auckland
1741
St John Ambulance Headquarters
2 Harrison Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Group's other details

0800 785 646


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual returns for individual members is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 8/12/2022 $439,828,000 $447,407,000
31/12/2021 9/12/2021 $422,704,000 $390,878,000
31/12/2020 16/12/2020 $354,218,000 $353,423,000
31/12/2019 17/12/2019 $314,083,000 $332,810,000
31/01/2019 24/01/2019 $298,473,000 $300,126,000
31/12/2017 5/12/2017 $275,624,000 $282,654,000
31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $268,155,000 $271,726,000
31/12/2015 21/01/2016 $256,696,000 $266,123,000
31/12/2014 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
31/12/2013 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Priory in New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem is a charitable trust domiciled in New Zealand. St John NZ exists to further the work of The Order of St John and to meet the needs of the community within New Zealand for high quality and readily accessible treatment and services. This includes the provision of a medical alarms service, training and advice in primary healthcare, including accident prevention in the workplace and the home as well as help, advice and training for other health related needs in the community. The mission of St John in New Zealand is to prevent and relieve sickness and injury, and to act to enhance the health and well-being of all people throughout New Zealand. The vision for St John is enhanced health and wellbeing for all New Zealanders.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, Disability, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Children / young people

Entity Structure

The governing body of St John worldwide is its Grand Council. In New Zealand the Priory Chapter oversees the philosophy of the organisation and approves the strategic and financial direction of St John in New Zealand. Priory Chapter is chaired by the Governor-General, as Prior of the Order in New Zealand. Priory Chapter is responsible for all of the work of St John in New Zealand but delegates authority to Priory Trust Board to oversee day-to-day activities. The Priory Trust appoints the CEO.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents