pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Animal Welfare Institute Of New Zealand
AWINZ
CC11235
N/A
Deregistered
11/11/2019
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of The Animal Welfare Institute Of New Zealand at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

27/09/2007
June 30
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 11/11/2019 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 27/09/2007

Address for service

PO Box 106551
Auckland City
Auckland Central
Auckland
1143
1308 State Highway 3
RD 5
Te Kuiti
3985

Charity's other details

021 632021


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Promotion of animal welfare by funding research

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Social services

Animals

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

Trust Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2016 11/01/2017 $4,161 $5
31/12/2015 9/12/2015 $7,078 $1,779
31/12/2014 31/12/2014 $15,749 $7,317
31/12/2013 3/01/2014 $59,387 $9,039
31/12/2012 25/01/2013 $4,843 $3,425
31/12/2011 28/12/2011 $3,112 $1,378
31/12/2010 10/01/2011 $24,323 $30,807

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jesse Wall Trustee 1/08/2017
Thomas Stanley Didovich Trustee 21/01/2015
Graeme John Coutts Trustee 27/06/2007
Wyn Norien Hoadley Trustee 27/06/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Neil Edward Wells Trustee 4/08/2017
Thomas Stanley Didovich Trustee 5/12/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/09/2019 NOC012
10/11/2017 NOC011
26/11/2015 NOC009
28/07/2015 NOC008
3/01/2014 NOC007
13/12/2012 AR006
28/12/2011 NOC002
10/01/2011 AR004
15/03/2010 AR003

Charity Documents