pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


FASD-CAN Incorporated
FASD-CAN
CC53623
9429043251414
Registered

Registration details

17/06/2016
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Fasd-Can Incorporated 17/06/2016
Fasd-CAN Incorporated 2/09/2020
FASD-CAN Incorporated 14/12/2021

Address for service

27A Hoskins Avenue
Hillsborough
Auckland
1042

Charity's other details

021644150
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/fasdsupport/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing support services to families and individuals affected by Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society funded by philanthropic donations and grants from government sources. Some incidental non-profit trading in resources.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 23/12/2022 $334,880 $214,592
31/12/2021 15/12/2021 $222,366 $9,510
31/12/2020 28/10/2020 $3,576 $9,904
31/12/2019 9/11/2019 $8,638 $8,799
31/12/2018 27/09/2018 $44,868 $39,026
31/12/2017 3/09/2017 $20,082 $5,529

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Diana Kawana Board member 23/12/2022
Gilbert Taurua Board member 23/12/2022
Huriana Elsa McRoberts Board Member 25/09/2021
Kathryn Jan Lawlor Board Member 25/09/2021
Tania Rose Henderson Board Member 25/09/2021
Ross Andrew Porter Treasurer 17/06/2021
jessica Harris committee member 28/10/2020
Leigh Henderson Chairperson 6/08/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gythlian Loveday officer 29/10/2022
Kim Ellen Milne Secretary 7/07/2022
Anna Mildred Gundesen committee member 7/05/2022
Lee Tempest Secretary 25/09/2021
Michelle Boardman Committee member 25/09/2021
Claire Gyde Chairperson 31/03/2021
Valerie McGinn Committee Member 30/09/2020
lyne Tinkler officer 12/09/2020
Christine Anne Rogan Committee Member 25/08/2018
Eleanor Bensemann Committee Member 25/08/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/12/2021 NOC015
28/08/2021 NOC013
15/07/2021 NOC012
15/07/2021 NOC011
21/04/2021 NOC010
21/04/2021 NOC009
20/10/2018 NOC006
4/07/2018 NOC004
5/12/2017 NOC003
16/08/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents