Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Child Cancer Foundation Incorporated
CC20434
9429042615361
Registered

Registration details

9/01/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 152
Shortland Street
Auckland
1140
76 Grafton Road
Grafton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

(09) 366 1270
ChildCancerFoundationNZ
childcancerfoundation
Child Cancer Foundation


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The support of Children living with cancer and their families.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 11/12/2023 $5,018,000 $5,324,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 5/12/2022 $5,308,000 $6,363,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 14/12/2021 $6,086,000 $6,470,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 24/11/2020 $7,967,000 $6,322,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 5/12/2019 $8,856,000 $6,037,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $6,560,000 $6,517,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $6,419,000 $5,536,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 15/12/2016 $6,653,000 $5,515,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 18/01/2016 $6,048,796 $5,390,966 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 26/11/2014 $7,039,647 $5,815,042 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Darlene Puti Tuiono Board Member 16/04/2024
Louise Rebecca Goss Finance Manager 12/12/2023
kerri Jo-anne Morgan Board Member 18/11/2023
Kerry Alan Price Policy and Advocacy Manager 18/11/2023
Reremoana Marian Hammond Board Member 18/11/2023
Stephen Warrick Willis Board Member 18/11/2023
Dan Walker Deputy Chair 3/12/2021
Monica Briggs Chief Executive 8/06/2021
Stephen Laughton Board Member 24/11/2018
Dennis Turton Board Chair 1/07/2014
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sierra Alef-Defoe Board member 23/05/2024
Darlene Tuiono Board Member 1/03/2024
Alexandra Hanlon Board Member 18/11/2023
Nick Beale Board Member 18/11/2023
Pat Wilkes Deputy Chair 18/11/2023
Jim Boult Board Member 19/11/2022
Karen Heslip Board Member 20/11/2021
Stuart Grant Hutchinson Board Member - Legal Advisor 27/09/2021
Robyn Kiddle CEO 20/02/2021
Dr Jane Elizabeth Skeen Board Member - Health Professional 24/11/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2024 NOC045
21/03/2024 NOC044
15/12/2021 NOC040
27/09/2021 NOC038
16/06/2021 NOC037
26/05/2021 NOC036
12/04/2021 NOC035
5/12/2018 NOC026
3/12/2018 NOC025
16/12/2016 NOC023
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.