Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


National Science Technology Roadshow Trust Board
CC24725
9429043175895
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 12662
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
C/- Canterbury Education Services
89 Nazareth Avenue
Middleton
Christchurch
8024

Charity's other details

044997865


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We strive to inspire the people of Aotearoa, New Zealand with the wonders and relevance of science, enabling them to engage with their world, so they will be science savvy citizens and innovators of the future. We are a ‘grassroots’ organisation, with proven services and extensive reach. The Trust makes a difference predominantly by supporting and augmenting the work of schools. This is especially needed at a time when research points to a lack of good science in primary and intermediate schools.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

Trust Board comprising six Trustees. We have three main areas of operation/action delivered by 7 FTE's and over 1,500 volunteers: • The Science Roadshow - for school students, predominantly in Yrs 5-9. • The Sir Paul Callaghan Science Academy and other teacher PLD • Science, technology and innovation experiences for the wider community (ie public).

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Roadshow Enterprises Limited CC48929

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 14/04/2023 $1,111,340 $1,010,382 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 10/03/2022 $868,080 $965,856 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 10/03/2021 $945,912 $912,115 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 9/04/2020 $1,165,876 $1,121,049 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 3/04/2019 $1,060,136 $993,940 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 22/05/2018 $996,564 $943,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 26/05/2017 $914,117 $1,035,841 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 29/04/2016 $802,246 $1,033,654 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 12/05/2015 $847,639 $1,100,536 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kaitlyn Martin Trustee 5/12/2023
Peter Chris Wikaira Trustee 27/09/2019
Renee Treve Maria Raroa Trustee 27/09/2019
Sue Leslie Trustee 28/04/2011
Richard Michael Hartshorn Trustee 15/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher Neville Le Cren Trustee 31/12/2023
Anthony Norris Briscoe Trustee 8/02/2023
Philip Howard Butler Trustee 12/07/2019
Carolyn English Trustee 23/01/2019
Murray David Giera Trustee 20/12/2013
Gillian Elizabeth Vosper Trustee 21/03/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/01/2024 NOC023
9/12/2023 NOC022
9/02/2023 NOC020
21/08/2019 NOC016
14/07/2019 NOC015
24/01/2019 NOC013
17/10/2018 NOC012
27/07/2018 NOC011
27/01/2014 NOC008
23/03/2013 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.