pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


RespectEd Aotearoa
SAPN
CC52973
9429043294053
Registered

Registration details

29/02/2016
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Sexual Abuse Prevention Network 29/02/2016
RespectEd Aotearoa 3/07/2020

Address for service

PO Box 11731
Manners Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6142
Level 2
220 Willis Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 801 8975
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/respectednz
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/respectednz
https://www.instagram.com/respected_nz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Objective of RespectEd Aotearoa is to prevent sexual abuse in New Zealand, by: (a) delivering expert advice and education; (b) addressing attitudes and values that support the prevalence of sexual violence; and (c) collaborating with other persons and organisations to more fully pursue this Objective.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Community development, sexual violence

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups, LGBTQIA Groups

Entity Structure

RespectEd is a charitable trust with a governance group made up of representatives of Wellington Rape Crisis (WRC), Wellington Sexual Abuse HELP Foundation & WellStop and three independent representatives. The collaboration between the three agencies has existed since the early 2000s & up until October 2015 RespectEd was a non-legal entity, with Wellington Rape Crisis acting as fundholder. RespectEd began to operate financially separately from WRC and employed its own staff on 1 August 2016.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
29/07/2022 20/07/2022 $1,588,715 $1,334,808
31/07/2021 14/07/2021 $1,398,114 $1,255,939
31/07/2020 30/07/2020 $1,053,523 $892,560
30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $600,799 $529,298
30/09/2018 6/09/2018 $345,458 $329,828
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $256,296 $222,768
30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $0 $0
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the period between 1 April 2019-31 December 2019 (9 months) due to a balance date change.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Claire Lyons Acting CEO 2/05/2022
Caroline Frances Rieger Trustee 15/02/2022
Rachael Anne Heslop Trustee 15/02/2022
Heather Lee McDonald Trustee/ Board Chair 15/02/2021
Katie Rose Bruce Trustee 4/05/2020
Mark William Rex King Trustee 4/05/2020
Kyla Rayner Trustee 10/02/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ashley Stuart Trustee 17/01/2022
Helen Sullivan Trustee 15/02/2021
Conor Joy Twyford Trustee 8/09/2020
Megan Annette Thomas Trustee 14/04/2020
Lesley Ayland Trustee 9/12/2019
Heather Lee McDonald Trustee 31/01/2018
Eleanor Butterworth Trustee 30/11/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/04/2022 NOC027
8/02/2022 NOC026
21/01/2022 NOC025
9/08/2021 NOC024
11/02/2021 NOC022
17/09/2020 NOC021
11/09/2020 NOC020
17/07/2020 NOC018
6/07/2020 NOC017
6/07/2020 NOC015

Charity Documents