Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Amberley Menz Shed Incorporated
CC51328
9429043257928
Registered

Registration details

11/12/2014
March 31

Address for service

75 Courage Road
Amberley
7410

Charity's other details

0211166713
MenzShed Amberley


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1.To advance education by establishing, maintaining and operating Men’s shed with equipment and resources, in which members of the public can share their knowledge and skills, applicable to practical projects. 2) Improving the physical and mental wellbeing of people through their participation in practical projects specific to the “Shed”.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides a safe enviroment for members to meet to undertake projects either for themselves or various groups in the community)

Other (please state)

(Provides an enviroment where members can support each other as well as being involved within the community. Projects have included greenhouse for school, aviary update,)

Older people

General public

Entity Structure

The organisation is governed by a Managing Committee that manages the day-to-day operations of the organisation

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 31/10/2024 29/10/2024 $24,428 $7,464 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 26/09/2023 $14,556 $5,222 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 11/08/2022 $9,557 $7,332 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 29/10/2021 $10,433 $3,979 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 1/09/2020 $11,309 $5,544 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/08/2019 $11,290 $3,923 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 10/09/2018 $9,464 $3,557 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 27/11/2017 $21,603 $4,839 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/12/2016 $6,962 $2,799 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rex Moir Secretary 1/03/2025
Lindsay Moir Chairman 9/05/2019
David Atkinson Committee Member 17/06/2018
Helen Newton Treasurer 27/07/2016
John Black Vice Chairman 27/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Pauline Frances Nelmes Secretary 31/01/2025
Ian Christopher Constable Committee Member 28/10/2024
Graham Charles Braddock Chairman 4/05/2023
Richard Barwick Committee Member 4/05/2023
Bruce Watson Committee Member 4/05/2022
Edward Gardner Committee Member 4/05/2022
Sandra Bamford Secretary 20/05/2021
Len Smith Committee Member 30/07/2020
Peter Nelmes Vice Chairman 30/07/2020
Allan Rennie Committee Member 18/05/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/04/2025 NOC013
2/03/2025 NOC012
30/05/2022 NOC008
10/09/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.