Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pillars Ka Pou Whakahou
CC23953
9429050678785
Registered

Registration details

5/5/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
PILLARS Incorporated 5/6/2008
Pillars-Ka Pou Whakahou Incorporated 10/17/2019
Pillars Ka Pou Whakahou 7/1/2022

Address for service

PO Box 97212
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
6A Jack Conway Avenue
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

0508 745527
https://www.facebook.com/Pillarsnz
https://twitter.com/PillarsNZ
https://www.instagram.com/pillarsnz/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance positive futures for the children and whānau of people in prison in Aotearoa by: a) Providing for children with a parent in prison and their families / whanau by promoting their social, educational, physical, cultural, emotional and spiritual wellbeing; b) Creating awareness of their needs to other service providers (schools, prisons, health professional, social workers) and community-based groups and providing training; c) Educating the government, policy makers and the general public on the longer-term impact of supporting children with a parent in prison and the value of investing in family support services as a resource; d) Providing nationwide counselling and support; e) Providing programmes and services; f) The preparation and distribution of relevant written and electronic information; g) Conducting research and information gathering that ensures an up to date picture of the issues surrounding them.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
6/30/2023 12/31/2023 12/11/2023 $2,030,596 $1,722,280 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2022 12/31/2022 12/15/2022 $1,921,684 $1,451,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2021 12/31/2021 12/14/2021 $1,967,737 $1,448,531 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2020 12/31/2020 12/20/2020 $2,168,161 $1,862,913 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2019 12/31/2019 12/3/2019 $1,540,387 $1,730,208 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2018 12/31/2018 12/19/2018 $1,401,595 $1,364,752 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2017 12/31/2017 12/19/2017 $1,062,472 $1,061,682 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2016 12/31/2016 12/15/2016 $987,251 $891,387 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2015 12/31/2015 12/22/2015 $757,990 $826,406 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2014 12/31/2014 12/18/2014 $828,364 $869,754 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tuhi Anthony Leef General Manager 2/20/2024
Kristen Louise Spooner Trustee 1/1/2024
Amelia Rachel Link Trustee 6/20/2023
Helen Elizabeth Susan Te Hira Trustee 8/16/2022
Vincent Hapi Trustee 8/16/2022
Dante Armond Fyfe Trustee 11/4/2021
Nicholas Anthony Burns Trustee 11/4/2021
Sandra Fay McCallum Trustee 11/6/2018
Nova Louise Salomen Trustee 2/11/2014
Susan Henson Trustee 12/16/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Logan Peter Smedley Trustee 12/31/2023
Manu Llewellyn Sione Trustee 11/3/2022
Helen Margaret Leahy Board Member 11/4/2021
Verna Mary McFelin Chief Executive 7/26/2020
Elizabeth Audrey Gordon President 11/26/2019
Darragh O'Riordan Board Member 11/18/2019
Ward Allan Kamo Board Member 11/18/2019
Georgia Coates Evans Secretary 9/17/2019
Glenda Mary Martin Board Member 7/23/2019
Paul Edgar James Evans Treasurer 7/17/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/20/2024 NOC053
1/25/2024 NOC051
7/12/2023 NOC049
4/14/2023 NOC048
10/3/2022 NOC046
7/15/2022 NOC045
6/28/2022 NOC044
6/3/2022 NOC043
11/30/2021 NOC041
9/28/2021 NOC040
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.