Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Network For Women In Dairying
Dairy Women's Network
CC35685
9429043133994
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
May 31

Address for service

PO Box 1468
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3240
Level 1
450 Anglesea Street
Hamilton City
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 974 4850
https://www.facebook.com/dwn.co.nz/
https://twitter.com/dairy_women
https://www.youtube.com/user/DairyWomensNetworkNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide learning and leadership development opportunities for members to add value to dairying businesses.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Mentor And Leadership

Other (please state)

(Women involved in Dairy Industry - farmers and others), Animals, General public

Entity Structure

Dairy Women's Network is funded by DairyNZ and commercial partners to provide learning and leadership development workshops, regional workshops and meetings, and online learning delivered via webinars.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/05/2023 30/11/2023 29/10/2023 $1,354,802 $1,388,042 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2022 30/11/2022 3/11/2022 $955,442 $945,153 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2021 30/11/2021 9/11/2021 $1,128,753 $1,118,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2020 30/11/2020 5/11/2020 $1,067,508 $1,037,205 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2019 30/11/2019 5/11/2019 $1,165,194 $1,118,021 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2018 30/11/2018 7/11/2018 $1,181,968 $1,127,553 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2017 30/11/2017 15/11/2017 $1,106,912 $1,197,199 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2016 30/11/2016 14/11/2016 $1,242,426 $1,214,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2015 30/11/2015 30/11/2015 $1,485,603 $1,197,038 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2014 30/11/2014 27/11/2014 $1,498,880 $1,453,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jessica Moore Trustee 22/06/2023
Lucy-Jane Johnson Trustee 28/02/2023
Jenna Smith Trustee 5/06/2020
Patricia Ann Rankin Chair 5/06/2020
Mark Heer Trustee 10/02/2016
Donna Smit Trustee 18/09/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rachel Haskew Trustee 26/10/2023
Karen Forlong Deputy Chair 22/06/2023
Rachel Haskew Trustee 22/06/2023
Sophie Stanley Trustee 26/10/2022
Pamela Storey Trustee 28/10/2020
Alison Gibb Trustee 5/06/2020
Tracy Brown Trustee 30/11/2019
Cathy Jean Brown Chair 31/10/2019
Justine Kidd Chair, Trustee 20/10/2016
Christine Rae Stevens Trustee 12/05/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/07/2023 NOC040
28/06/2023 NOC039
10/03/2023 NOC038
28/03/2022 NOC036
9/11/2020 NOC034
2/11/2020 NOC032
8/06/2020 NOC031
10/01/2020 NOC030
10/01/2020 NOC029
4/11/2019 NOC027
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.