Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Kakano Aotearoa Trust
Te Kākano
CC23553
9429043171859
Registered

Registration details

28/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

6 Takahe Lane
Wānaka
Wanaka
9305
246 Wanaka-Mount Aspiring Road
Wānaka 9305
Wānaka
9305

Charity's other details

027 905 8863
https://facebook.com/tekakano
https://www.instagram.com/tekakano/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To inspire community native habitat restoration through propagation, education and hands-on participation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides native plants for eligible native habitat restoration projects in the community. Offers an environmental education programme for children of all ages.)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(Community at large), Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Te Kākano is governed by a board of trustees. To Kākano has no regular staff, however it does have a part time nursery manager, a trust manager and education manager on contract, and contracts others for specific roles as required.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 26/05/2023 $178,291 $141,866 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 19/04/2022 $170,239 $121,919 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 26/02/2021 $119,700 $101,881 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 29/04/2020 $136,894 $76,745 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 20/05/2019 $62,425 $55,178 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/05/2018 $91,690 $79,094 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 23/05/2017 $90,296 $57,036 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 3/05/2016 $70,844 $51,097 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 14/05/2015 $43,712 $62,053 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 13/05/2014 $48,229 $55,711 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael McLean Toepfer Trustee 29/11/2023
Christopher John Dillon Trustee 27/10/2022
Rebecca McCormack Trustee 18/06/2022
Shen nee Grinter Trustee 7/11/2021
Andrew Gawith Trustee & Treasurer 1/07/2020
Carrie Rebecca Williams Trustee 1/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mark Orbell Trustee 22/08/2023
Benjamin James Taylor Trustee 14/02/2023
Murray Walker Trustee 14/12/2022
Shennee Grinter Trustee 3/11/2022
Nicholas Sargood Mills Trustee 28/09/2022
Gaynor Corkery Trustee 25/04/2022
Emma Conyngham Trustee 15/01/2022
Anna Hiatt Trustee 14/07/2021
Allison O'Brien Trustee 19/08/2020
Neil Woodrow Trustee & Treasurer 13/07/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/03/2024 NOC037
30/11/2023 NOC036
9/10/2023 NOC035
16/12/2022 NOC033
27/10/2022 NOC032
4/10/2022 NOC031
20/06/2022 NOC030
28/04/2022 NOC029
17/01/2022 NOC027
3/10/2020 NOC025
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.