pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Bamboo Foundation
CC46460
N/A
Deregistered
07/12/2018
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Bamboo Foundation at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

13/04/2011
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 7/12/2018 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 13/04/2011
Name change history
Name Effective Date
GVN Charitable Trust 14/04/2011
Bamboo-GVN Charitable Trust 15/04/2016
Bamboo Foundation 23/02/2017

Address for service

PO Box 30968
Lower Hutt
5040
61 Seaview Road
105 High Street
Seaview
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 5661197

Africa

Ethiopia, Ghana, Kenya, Rwanda, South Africa, Uganda

South America

Argentina, Peru

Asia

Cambodia, Nepal, Philippines, Thailand, Vietnam


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides religious services / activities

Promotion of volunteering

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Religious activities, International activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups, Vunerable Women and children


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2015 15/12/2015 $1,754,076 $1,937,005
30/09/2014 11/11/2014 $2,037,296 $2,201,338
30/09/2013 23/08/2013 $2,459,893 $2,273,469
30/09/2012 21/12/2012 $1,427,272 $1,545,461

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Foster Murray Trustee 21/03/2016
Stephen Williams Trustee 21/03/2016
Colin Gordon Salisbury Board Member 22/03/2011
Graham Andrew Fyfe Board Member 22/03/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Erin Theresa Cassidy Board Member 1/03/2016
Karen Ann Ward Board Member 22/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/02/2017 NOC008
22/02/2017 NOC006
15/04/2016 NOC005
21/03/2016 NOC004
2/03/2016 NOC003
16/12/2015 NOC002
21/12/2012 AR001

Charity Documents