Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kiwi CRPS Trust
Kiwi CRPS
CC50843
9429043257072
Registered

Registration details

17/07/2014
March 31

Address for service

19 Fincham Road
Raumati Beach
Paraparaumu
5032

Charity's other details

0212116991
Kiwicrps
Instagram


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To establish a supportive network connecting all adults in New Zealand affected by CRPS. To provide education for, and reduce stigma amongst, the general public, health care and care professionals

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Kiwi Crps Charitable Trust is governed by a Board who makes financial and policy decisions. Committees undertake specific projects, tasks and assist with the day to day running of online support groups for those living with or, supporting others with CRPS. They also promote awareness, advocacy and exchanging information, experiences and education. We assist in setting up regional groups wherever there is an interest.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 18/09/2023 $1,668 $936 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 23/09/2022 $3 $78 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/12/2021 19/12/2021 $3 $75 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 4/04/2020 $2,321 $155 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 7/04/2020 $801 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 2/04/2020 $533 $790 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/10/2017 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 27/11/2016 $2,828 $3,249 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 10/11/2015 $9,936 $763 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joanne Marie Edwards Chairperson 30/03/2021
Deborah anne beazley Secretary/Treasurer 12/03/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Adele Marie Evans Board Member 7/11/2023
Mandy Catherine Robinson Board member 7/11/2023
Simone Hortense Freeman Board member 7/06/2023
Lydia Flora Alice Knell Trustee 20/05/2023
Anne Louise Davison Life Board member 9/04/2022
Leanne Jean Walker board member 28/03/2021
caren june ashford board member 22/03/2021
Simone Freeman Trustee 30/03/2020
Felicia Anne-Marie Clark Trustee 28/08/2019
Ailsa Joyce Clement Lipscombe Trustee 25/02/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/11/2023 NOC029
20/10/2023 NOC028
14/06/2023 NOC023
8/07/2022 NOC020
4/07/2022 NOC019
8/12/2021 NOC017
23/08/2021 NOC016
4/04/2021 NOC015
3/04/2021 NOC014
25/03/2021 NOC013
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.