Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Wise Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Blueprint NZ Limited
Blueprint Trust Board
Ecopeople Limited
Linkage Limited
LinkPeople Limited
Mental Health Solutions Limited
Pacific Inc. Limited
Pathways Health Limited
Pathways Trust Board
Wise Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Group Details


Wise Group
Wise Trust Board

Registration details

Registered
30/06/2008
CC41167
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 307
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
293 Grey Street
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3216

Group's other details

07 857 1200
07 857 1296

Oceania

Australia

Europe

United Kingdom


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 7/12/2023 $168,614,000 $161,154,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 28/11/2022 $156,254,000 $144,954,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 22/11/2021 $133,129,000 $128,330,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2020 $105,471,000 $104,448,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 23/12/2019 $91,472,000 $90,199,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $81,761,000 $80,508,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $76,381,000 $76,345,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $72,369,000 $71,478,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 16/12/2015 $74,880,004 $74,088,639 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 22/12/2014 $70,672,111 $70,280,653 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To create fresh possibilities and services for the wellbeing of people, organisations and communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides services to people experiencing mental health and addiction challenges.), Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Health

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Social services, Employment

Other (please state)

(People experiencing mental health and addiction challenges and their Whanau. Vulnerable people.)

Entity Structure

The Group consists of the ultimate parent, Wise Trust Board, and its 100 % owned subsidiaries, Blueprint NZ Limited, LinkPeople Limited, Mental Health Solutions Limited, Pacific Inc. Limited, Pathways Health Limited, Pathways Trust Board, Te Pou Limited, Wild Bamboo Limited, Wise Management Services Limited, and Workwise Employment Limited. The Trust’s subsidiaries are incorporated and domiciled in New Zealand.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/05/2018 NOC006

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.