Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tokaikolo Christian Church Trust Board
CC33024
9429042887485
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 43104
Mangere
Auckland
2153
148 Coronation Road
Mangere Bridge
Manukau
Auckland
2022

Charity's other details

09 6344585


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(1) To disseminate by all means and avenues possible a knowledge of Jesus Christ and to further the practices and principles of Christianity (2) To encourage the daily reading of the scriptures amongst believers (3) To act with Christian care and compassion in the provision of assistance / encouragement to people in need (4) To engage in or to sponsor the preparation, editing, printing & publishing of books, booklets, magazines & other such literature, tape recordings, records, films & radio & television programmes

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The member of the board shall never be less than five

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/03/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 30/09/2023 12/12/2023 $850,460 $877,793 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/07/2022 28/09/2022 $1,515,053 $1,480,551 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 28/02/2021 26/02/2021 $1,351,263 $1,132,525 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 31/12/2019 $2,168,525 $1,012,330 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/03/2019 28/05/2019 $1,974,962 $1,210,979 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 9/04/2018 $879,637 $729,335 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 9/04/2018 $782,409 $803,068 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 14/01/2016 $836,869 $800,715 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 13/01/2016 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Saia Tatafu International President 28/07/2023
Frank Koloi Trustee 10/04/2023
Henele Telefoni Trustee 10/04/2023
Lisiate Tahitu'a Trustee 10/04/2023
Paula Matalave Trustee 10/04/2023
Peter Tanginoa Trustee 10/04/2023
Samisoni Pauta Trustee 10/04/2023
Tau'a'alo Va'enuku Trustee 10/04/2023
Makalofi Mavae Treasurer 1/03/2017
Sam Ofele Saulala Trust Board secretary 31/10/2015
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Viliami Saulala Chairperson 15/08/2023
Filimone Vailea Saulala Trustee 29/01/2023
Tevita Kasimea Lepolo Trustee 5/05/2022
Nesiasi Kolo International President 3/01/2022
Sione Tu'italau Hala Trustee 15/06/2021
Liufau Vailea Saulala International President 19/11/2020
Fakaanaua Michael Maka Trustee 3/02/2020
Sailosi Kafa Treasurer 1/01/2019
Fakaatu'i Taufa Trustee 13/11/2018
Sitaleki Tupou Trustee 25/09/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/12/2023 NOC022
23/03/2021 NOC018
20/08/2018 NOC014
5/10/2016 NOC011
30/09/2016 NOC009
21/12/2015 NOC008
23/12/2013 NOC007
19/10/2012 AR005
18/10/2012 NOC003
20/02/2012 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.