Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Home Grown Waiheke Trust
HGWT
CC52357
9429043272167
Registered

Registration details

7/07/2015
June 30

Address for service

21 Hamilton Road
Surfdale
Waiheke Island
1081

Charity's other details

021 0422801
https://www.facebook.com/HomeGrownWaiheke
https://www.instagram.com/homegrownwaiheke/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake gardening and composting projects and research to increase food resilience and self-sufficiency in food production on Waiheke island.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Promotion of volunteering, Food resilience

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust governed by volunteer Trustee board ranging between two and eight members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 31/12/2023 $27,034 $13,034 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 15/12/2022 $9,060 $9,485 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 13/01/2022 $5,398 $13,310 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 13/01/2022 $5,515 $10,089 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 20/11/2019 $3,302 $3,898 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 20/11/2019 $18,162 $13,849 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 12/11/2017 $40,142 $29,437 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 19/01/2017 $19,467 $2,663 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hadas Ore Secretary 31/10/2023
Holly Sian Anketell Trustee 31/10/2023
Eugenia Maria Masllorens Trustee 7/02/2023
Lynsey Gaye Champion Trustee 7/02/2023
Kylee-Jane Matthews Chairperson 15/11/2021
Livne Ore Treasurer 15/11/2021
Penelope Anne Holmes Trustee 9/03/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Susan Barker Secretary 18/12/2023
Dominic James Bernell Ross Trustee 5/06/2023
Jane Cooper Secretary 7/02/2023
Erin Nicola Sanders Trustee 9/05/2022
Kathryn Voyles Trustee 7/03/2022
Charlotte Parkes Chairperson 15/11/2021
Kathleen Mary Adams Board member 15/11/2021
Neil Hefford Treasurer (ex offio) 15/11/2021
Graeme Robert Johnson Trustee 9/12/2020
Sally Margaret Lumsden Chairperson 9/12/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/12/2023 NOC025
15/11/2023 NOC024
31/10/2023 NOC023
6/06/2023 NOC022
7/02/2023 NOC021
14/06/2022 NOC019
9/05/2022 NOC018
7/03/2022 NOC017
3/03/2022 NOC016
2/03/2022 NOC015
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.