Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


DermNet New Zealand Trust
CC50036
9429043254064
Registered

Registration details

29/11/2013
June 30

Address for service

145 Great South Road
Greenlane
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details


Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

North America

United States

Europe

United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust exists primarily for the advancement of education in the field of dermatology and medical research and development in skin related health issues, including skin cancer, and to make such information available to not only medical practitioners, but to members of the public as well.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Educational resources for medical sector

Education / training / research

Health

General public

People with disabilities, Doctors, Medical profession generally

Entity Structure

Trust Board of 5 Dermatologists : Chairperson, Secretary, 2 non-office bearers, Ex officioTreasurer. Website team: General manager, Content Manager, Medical writer, IT support, Images team, Contracted Dermatologist Editor/ sub editor, composed of 2 full time employees, 3 part time employees (3.7 FTE), 3 contractors

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 1/12/2023 $957,491 $596,881 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 28/12/2022 $940,873 $461,893 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 20/12/2021 $515,744 $387,662 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $444,562 $458,257 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 18/12/2019 $322,151 $398,870 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $435,852 $475,857 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $517,927 $506,175 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $217,904 $141,962 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $134,792 $74,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 11/12/2014 $75,225 $55,393 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ken Ip Trustee 27/11/2023
Kenneth Wong ex-officio Treasurer 27/11/2023
Gerhard Eichhoff Chairperson 17/08/2022
Shan Edwards Secretary 17/08/2022
Louise Reiche Ex-officio trustee 2/06/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Martin Keefe Trustee Secretary 27/11/2023
Tien Ming Lim Treasurer 27/11/2023
Steve Helander Chair 17/08/2022
Steven Lamb Treasurer 17/08/2022
Victoria Emma Scott-Lang Treasurer 1/08/2019
Anthony Yung Trustee 3/08/2018
Amanda Margaret Oakley Trustee 15/03/2018
Marius Rademaker Trustee 29/01/2018
Sandra Maria Winhoven Trustee 17/08/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/10/2022 NOC018
7/10/2022 NOC017
29/09/2022 NOC016
26/08/2022 NOC015
29/08/2020 NOC012
12/08/2020 NOC011
5/08/2020 NOC010
24/09/2018 NOC007
24/09/2018 NOC006
23/08/2018 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.