pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hope Worldwide-Pakistan
Humanitarian Organization for Poverty Eradication
CC54345
9429045988516
Registered

Registration details

15/02/2017
March 31

Address for service

176 A , Lincoln Road
Henderson
Auckland
0610

Charity's other details

+642102544023
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/hopeworldwidepakistan
Twitter icon image
hopeworldwide1

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa

Africa

South Africa

South America

Brazil

Asia

Korea, South, Malaysia, Pakistan, Sri Lanka, Thailand

Europe

Czech Republic, Denmark, France, Germany, Norway, Switzerland


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing possible support to the most disadvantaged, marginalized and vulnerable groups to come up with their latent potential for social and economic empowerment. The organization works to empower the marginalized and deprived communities enabling them to fight for their rights and support them through providing opportunities,advocacy and empowering to become effective part of the society. HOPE has strive to help communities to realize their best potential by providing economic,social,moral and financial assistance. We provide practical support and psycho-social assistance to vulnerable people, foster connections between communities, and educate the wider community of the needs, strengths and aspirations of these groups. HOPE’s mission is to promote and safeguard the fundamental human rights of vulnerable groups including migrants, asylum seekers and refugees in New Zealand and in the wider-world, whose lives have been traumatized by disasters, poverty, persecution or discrimination.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Promoting empowerment ,social justice and protect the fundamental human rights of vulnerable groups by advocating against Human rights abuses, supporting ,educating and building their capacity.

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, International activities

Other (please state)

(Marginalized ,disadvantaged and vulnerable groups including asylum seekers and refugees, whose lives have been traumatized by disasters, poverty, persecution or discrimination.)

Entity Structure

Our Trust deed states that "3.1 This organization will have a managing committee (the committee) minimum of three persons, and maximum of five persons, three of which would be at the position of Chairperson, Treasurer and Secretary General and additional two officers may be added as Board Members"

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 28/09/2022 $316,653 $303,255
30/09/2021 3/08/2021 $201,656 $92,084
30/11/2020 30/11/2020 $12,098 $11,022
30/09/2019 5/08/2019 $7,888 $8,162
30/09/2018 2/08/2018 $10,295 $9,741
30/09/2017 26/07/2017 $1,880 $1,749

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Maria Kastler Secretary General 17/02/2022
Rex Kelvin Wilmshurst Board Member 28/08/2018
Khurram Shahid Malik Chief Executive Officer 9/02/2017
Nasim Sadiq Gill Treasurer 9/02/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nuuausala Lopesi Board Member 13/05/2022
Khalid Yaqoob Secretary General 17/02/2022
Cyrus Leonard Rose Liaison and Development Coordinator 18/01/2021
Stephen Sadiq Chief Advisor 19/03/2019
Joshua Soroya Trustee 28/08/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/11/2022 NOC018
1/07/2022 NOC016
14/02/2022 NOC015
3/08/2021 NOC014
18/01/2021 NOC012
3/07/2020 NOC010
12/04/2019 NOC008
6/09/2018 NOC006
1/02/2018 NOC004
28/08/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents