Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Save Animals From Exploitation Incorporated
SAFE for Animals
CC40428
9429042724353
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 5750
Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142

Charity's other details

0800 SAVEANIMALS
www.facebook.com/SAFEnewzealand
https://twitter.com/safenewzealand
https://www.instagram.com/safenewzealand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To prevent the suffering, abuse and exploitation of animals.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Fund-raising

Animals

General public

Entity Structure

SAFE is governed by a Board of up to nine elected members, which direct SAFE in line with its Constitution. SAFE maintains a register of members of the Incorporated Society. Dedicated staff are employed by SAFE to further its purpose and mission. SAFE also engages with volunteers to support its work for animals.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 26/09/2023 $2,469,209 $1,992,970 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 8/09/2022 $2,141,773 $6,797,885 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 15/09/2021 $1,823,933 $2,114,944 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 28/08/2020 $2,206,546 $1,893,408 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 16/09/2019 $3,028,193 $1,646,342 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 27/08/2018 $6,132,948 $1,672,820 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 18/09/2017 $1,464,488 $1,400,808 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $1,373,950 $1,057,483 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 29/10/2015 $1,134,510 $966,614 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 20/10/2014 $906,823 $952,143 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kat MacMillan Board member 29/08/2023
Troy Coyle Board member 24/11/2022
Marcelo Rodriguez Ferrere Board member 30/11/2021
Gareth Thomas Llewellyn Hughes Chair 18/10/2020
Logan Peter Smedley Treasurer 2/09/2020
Debra Ashton-Knowles Chief Executive Officer 1/09/2018
Katharine Birks Secretary 1/08/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Timothy Groenendaal Board member 1/11/2023
Kirsten Magnusson Board Member 1/11/2022
Dallas Joy Hopkins Board Member 4/07/2022
Mark Rocket Chair 16/06/2021
Troy Coyle Secretary 6/10/2020
Sarah Barnes Treasurer 17/08/2020
Glen Desmond Real Board Member 1/08/2019
Joanne Caroline Child Treasurer 1/08/2019
Saar Cohen-Ronen Board Member 1/08/2019
Marieke Jasmijn de Boo CEO 26/05/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2023 NOC065
1/09/2023 NOC062
20/02/2023 NOC061
18/01/2023 NOC060
1/12/2022 NOC059
10/10/2022 NOC058
2/05/2022 NOC054
10/03/2022 NOC053
10/02/2022 NOC052
20/01/2022 NOC051
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.