pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Marianne Caughey Smith-Preston Memorial Rest Homes Trust
Caughey Preston Trust
CC20123
9429042765103
Registered

Registration details

27/11/2007
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 28721
Remuera
Auckland
1541
49 Fairview Avenue
Fairview Heights
Auckland
0632

Charity's other details

0274810303


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing Rest Home and Hospital care for the elderly.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Rest homes and hospitals

Other (please state)

(Aged Care Rest homes and hospitals), Health

Older people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2021 2/03/2021 $1,212,338 $1,390,889
31/03/2020 18/03/2020 $1,238,513 $782,148
31/03/2019 4/03/2019 $1,978,757 $1,425,645
31/03/2018 12/03/2018 $12,223,102 $30,766,220
31/03/2017 9/03/2017 $17,523,860 $18,700,386
31/03/2016 24/03/2016 $17,018,817 $18,171,127
31/03/2015 16/02/2015 $18,491,666 $17,447,169
31/03/2014 17/02/2014 $12,564,753 $12,984,101
30/06/2013 19/06/2013 $18,026,007 $16,878,882

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Elizabeth Mary Caughey Trustee 1/10/2018
John William Stewart Trustee 28/09/2016
Terence Roderick Cornelius Trustee 2/05/2012
Rachel Kathleen Ann Mcqueen Trustee 26/05/2010
Celia Caughey Trustee 27/03/2007
Peter Richard Cameron Trustee 25/03/2003
Andrew Stuart Caughey Chairman 7/09/2000

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard Caughey Trustee 26/09/2018
Aaron James Ivan Armstrong Trustee 16/05/2017
Margaret Clare Tapper Trustee 1/02/2017
Ian William Kendall Trustee 3/02/2016
John Carnachan Trustee 30/09/2010
Denis Caughey Trustee 4/04/2010
George Caughey Trustee 18/02/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/08/2021 NOC024
16/12/2019 NOC021
18/11/2019 NOC020
3/10/2018 NOC018
3/10/2018 NOC017
6/06/2017 NOC015
6/03/2017 NOC013
17/11/2016 NOC012
10/10/2016 NOC011
6/09/2016 NOC010

Charity Documents