pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Taiwhenua O Heretaunga Trust
CC20582
9429042829942
Registered

Registration details

21/01/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 718
Hastings
4156
821 Orchard Road
Camberley
Hastings
4120

Charity's other details

(06)8715350
(06)8715351


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mauri ora ki te mana Māori o Heretaunga: To uplift the well-being of Heretaunga Māori

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are a community mandated organisation governed by a board of 15 trustees. Each trustee is a representative of the Marae that reside in the Heretaunga area. We provide a range of services in health, social, education and community development.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Waingākau Housing Development CC58007

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 23/12/2021 $36,723,267 $31,142,706
31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $28,072,654 $26,736,747
31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $24,310,531 $23,915,575
31/12/2018 21/11/2018 $20,521,735 $20,079,140
31/12/2017 29/11/2017 $14,771,404 $14,534,377
31/12/2016 23/11/2016 $14,001,658 $14,067,934
31/12/2015 26/11/2015 $13,874,054 $13,916,462
31/12/2014 4/12/2014 $12,919,596 $13,089,816
31/12/2013 18/11/2013 $11,653,200 $12,255,961
31/12/2012 3/12/2012 $11,423,383 $10,893,868

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Waylyn June Tahuri-Whaipakanga Chief Executive Officer 24/05/2021
Henni Carlson Trustee 5/03/2020
Monica Kendrick Trustee 7/02/2019
Ripeka Kireka Trustee 7/02/2019
Bridget Joanne Paku Trustee 25/01/2019
Leah Ripeka Hapuku-Annan Trustee 24/01/2019
Aberielle Robin Trustee 1/01/2019
Christine Tamati Trustee 1/01/2019
Horiana Williams Trustee 1/01/2019
Moana Lee Mackey Trustee 1/01/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
George Haig Reedy Chief Executive 7/05/2021
Turori Whetu-Rangi Chapman Trustee 10/01/2020
Aretha Edwards Trustee 25/01/2019
Alayna Ann Watene Trustee 1/01/2019
Elizabeth Huata Trustee 1/01/2019
Hopaea Walker Trustee 1/01/2019
Jonna Rameka Trustee 1/01/2019
Koreene Henry Trustee 1/01/2019
Lisa Gay Tuhi Trustee 1/01/2019
Take Derek Mulligan Trustee 1/01/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/10/2020 NOC034
3/05/2019 NOC030
22/02/2019 NOC029
15/12/2017 NOC027
4/09/2017 NOC025
7/03/2016 NOC023
29/02/2016 NOC022
18/02/2016 NOC021
17/02/2016 NOC020
8/01/2015 NOC019

Charity Documents