pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Supreme Sikh Council of New Zealand Incorporated
N/A
CC47436
9429043185511
Registered

Registration details

29/02/2012
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 76033
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
70 Takanini School Road
Takanini
2112

Charity's other details

027 4483758

Asia

India


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To organize, facilitate and promote Sikhism in New Zealand as well as liaison Worldwide To maintain the Sikh doctrines as enunciated in Guru Granth Sahib Ji. To provide religious, cultural, political, social and educational services to Sikhs of New Zealand through Gurudwara Sahib and other institutions as may be appropriate. To promote and foster a better understanding of Sikhism amongst tje people of New Zealand. To preserve and promote the history & heritage of Sikhis in New Zealand. To promote Sikh arts, culture and sports among the Sikhs as well as wider community of the New Zealand. To discourage the use of any drugs or intoxicants including tobacco among the Sikhs. To interact and co-operate with other community organisations for health and conductive relations. To establish a common platform for all Sikhs of New Zealand. To orgnaise Nagar Kirtan's blood donation camps, educational camps, Sikh Seminars and other religious, cultural & sport functions. To help needy and poor peop

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Full Executive Body

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 22/09/2021 $196,983 $165,350
30/09/2020 10/09/2020 $122,409 $115,561
30/09/2019 25/09/2019 $20,932 $29,601
30/09/2018 21/09/2018 $22,503 $9,754
30/09/2017 30/10/2017 $55,160 $57,434
30/09/2016 5/09/2017 $73,408 $68,414
30/09/2015 18/12/2015 $26,336 $25,392
30/09/2014 13/10/2014 $193,238 $204,721
30/09/2013 13/10/2014 $193,246 $193,246
30/09/2012 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Balwinder Singh Executive Member 17/08/2017
Lakwinder Singh Executive Member 17/08/2017
Marjinder Singh Executive Officer 17/08/2017
Sukhdev Singh Executive Member 17/08/2017
Bhupinder Singh Executive Member 28/12/2013
Hardeep Singh Member 28/02/2011
Harpreet Singh Member 28/02/2011
Kashmir Singh Member 28/02/2011
Rajinder Singh Member 28/02/2011
Ranvir Singh Member 28/02/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hardev Singh Brar Member 8/08/2014
Manpreet Singh Member 8/08/2014
Pradeep Singh Member 8/08/2014
Ram Singh Member 8/08/2014
Sarwan Singh Member 8/08/2014
Verinder Singh Member 6/12/2013

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents