Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Special Olympics South Otago Trust
CC42334
9429050341672
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Special Olympics South Otago 30/06/2008
Special Olympics South Otago Trust 17/08/2022

Address for service

1 Henley Drive
Balclutha
9230

Charity's other details

0276116456


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We provide quality year-round training and competition in a variety of sports for all children and adults with an intellectual disability, giving those athletes opportunities to develop physical fitness, demonstrate courage and participate in sharing life skills and friendships with their families, other athletes and the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Volunteers run sports training and competitions for people with intellectual disabilities

People with disabilities

Health, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Sports activities for people with intellectual disabilities

Other (please state)

(People with intellectual disabilities), Children / young people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Special Olympics NZ is an incorporated society and also a registered charity. Special Olympics NZ is governed by a Board of Trustees and a Chief Executive Officer. Please refer to Special Olympics NZ for a list of the current Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 2/05/2025 $7,149 $6,073 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 12/04/2024 $899 $1,308 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 28/05/2023 $502 $946 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 9/06/2022 $159 $270 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 6/05/2021 $397 $692 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 9/06/2020 $764 $1,608 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 19/06/2019 $929 $1,215 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 25/06/2018 $1,545 $7,117 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $3,423 $2,087 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 22/06/2016 $1,427 $1,204 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ruth McRae Trustee 3/06/2024
Donna Maree Pettitt Committee Member 10/04/2024
Diane Joan Ollerenshaw Secretary Treasurer 30/03/2020
Lana Mangham-McNamara Chairperson 30/03/2020
Pamela McDonald Committee Member 16/04/2018
Diane Craig Committee 19/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jennifer MacKenzie Committee 20/08/2023
Michelle Pirie Committee Member 25/04/2021
Anne Shanks Secretary 30/03/2020
Ivy Grant Committee 30/03/2020
Judy Nicol Chairperson 30/03/2020
Margaret Crowley Committee 4/07/2017
Joan Ollecenshaw Committee Member/ Treasurer 27/06/2017
Glen Ward Co-ordinator 30/12/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/04/2024 NOC023
10/10/2023 NOC022
10/10/2023 NOC021
28/05/2023 NOC019
18/08/2022 NOC017
16/08/2022 NOC016
16/08/2022 NOC014
12/07/2022 NOC013
8/06/2016 NOC006
7/08/2015 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42351) on 17 August 2022.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.