pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Trust Waiheke
CC40059
9429043117345
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Me Aroha Waiheke Foundation 30/06/2008
Trust Waiheke 2/08/2019

Address for service

40 Motukaha Road
RD 1
Waiheke Island
1971

Charity's other details

09 372 7030


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

for the relief of poverty among the people of New Zealand, and especially within the community of Waiheke Island; for advancement of education for the benefit of the people of New Zealand and especially within the community of Waiheke Island; to benefit the community of Waiheke Island, New Zealand with especial focus on social, cultural, economic, environmental and/or spiritual well being, directed at people who are under a disability or deprivation;

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Promotion of volunteering

General public

The people and communities of Waiheke Island

Entity Structure

Policy: Board of Trustees Administration: Staff (presently volunteer) Direction: Steering Committee

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 28/08/2022 $0 $0
30/09/2021 11/04/2021 $0 $0
30/09/2020 25/08/2020 $0 $0
30/09/2019 24/07/2019 $0 $0
30/09/2018 19/09/2018 $0 $0
30/09/2017 28/08/2017 $0 $0
30/09/2016 28/02/2017 $422 $1,547
30/09/2015 10/11/2015 $21,121 $19,415
30/09/2014 3/09/2014 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Claude Lewenz Secretary 31/07/2019
Michael Charles Maahs Trustee 31/07/2019
Graeme Revell Trustee 26/08/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Darlene Tana Trustee 31/07/2019
Francesca Elischer Trustee 31/07/2019
Jerome Partington Trustee 26/08/2016
Katherine Russell Trustee 31/03/2016
Pete Ibbertson - 31/03/2016
Phil Cockfield Trustee 31/03/2016
Simon Harvey trustee 31/03/2016
Phillip Alan Lockyer Trustee 11/12/2013
Carin Wilson Chair 22/07/2013
Claude Lewenz Director 22/07/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/08/2019 NOC015
31/07/2019 NOC014
29/08/2016 NOC010
29/08/2016 NOC009
7/05/2016 NOC007
21/01/2014 NOC006
10/12/2013 NOC005
24/09/2013 AR005
22/07/2013 NOC001
15/05/2009 AR002

Charity Documents