Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


A Change for Better - The ACFB Fund
The ACFB Fund
CC61221
9429051371524
Registered

Registration details

30/01/2023
March 31

Address for service

16 Taumutu Road
Southbridge
7602

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1.2 Purposes of the Trust: The purposes of the trust are as follows: 1.2.1 To support, promote and enable the mental wellbeing of the inhabitants of New Zealand of whatever ethnic origin, age, race or sexual orientation; and to take all measures both preventative and remedial designed or likely to prevent or reduce the incidence of mental ill-health. 1.2.2 To support and assist individuals and/or organisations concerned with promoting the mental health and wellbeing of the inhabitants of NZ

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

General public

Entity Structure

Money donated to the charity will be distributed amongst those who apply to be granted wellness support

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2023 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 7/06/2024 $188,763 $139,907 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amy Lorraine Marschall Clinical Director 31/07/2023
Jacqueline Bernadette Ten Hove Secretary 31/07/2023
Ashley Mae Cairns Chairperson 1/01/2023
Joseph Robert Cairns Chairperson 1/01/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/04/2024 NOC004
22/03/2024 NOC003
29/12/2023 NOC002
29/12/2023 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.