pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Reemi Charitable Trust
Reemi
CC56441
9429047188631
Registered

Registration details

7/12/2018
March 31

Address for service

74A McKenzie Road
Mangere Bridge
Auckland
2022

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
facebook.com/reemi.org
instagram.com/reemi_org

Oceania

Vanuatu

Africa

Central African Republic, Mali, Somalia, South Sudan

Asia

Bangladesh, India


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing wonen's health education and sanitation products to vulnerable women in New Zealand and in developing countries

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

General public

Entity Structure

We have a head office based in Auckland. Our trust deed states that we must have between three and seven trustees. We currently have five Trustees who constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: chairperson, treasurer and secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $84,428 $167,551
30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $76,550 $86,296
30/09/2020 25/09/2020 $207,800 $44,776
30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $28,374 $12,951

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Murray James Burt Trustee 23/03/2023
Mark Wynyard Fountain Trustee 17/08/2020
Catherine Elizabeth de Zwaan Trustee 16/10/2018
Emily Ying Hey Au-Young Trustee 16/10/2018
Kate Maree Falconer Trustee 16/10/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jonathan Charles Dann Trustee 16/03/2023
Ashleigh Grace Howan Trustee 24/01/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/05/2023 NOC010
26/01/2023 NOC009
14/10/2021 NOC007
7/10/2020 NOC004
4/10/2019 NOC002

Charity Documents