Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Plunket Foundation
CC35424
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 5474
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
LEVEL 3 SIMPL HOUSE
40 Mercer Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 470 4904


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The nature of the Trust’s activities is for the advancement of Plunket in promoting and supporting the functions of Plunket, and to advocate and support the broad objectives of Plunket. An endowment fund has been created to provide independent financial support to Plunket to assist in those objectives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Health

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Trust is a Not-For-Profit Public Benefit Entity, governed by a Board of Trustees. All administrative work is undertaken by employees of the Royal New Zealand Plunket Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 29/11/2023 $1,224,359 $451,308 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 26/10/2022 $985,316 $950,331 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 30/09/2021 $1,010,798 $733,017 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 8/12/2020 $1,001,902 $1,231,183 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 9/12/2019 $1,239,626 $927,848 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $4,454,150 $213,319 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $894,898 $612,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 2/02/2017 $384,624 $349,863 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $604,393 $762,624 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 22/12/2014 $304,701 $47,307 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jayne Yvette Brophy Trustee 24/11/2023
Mark Jurgeleit Trustee 14/07/2021
Helen Christine Lake Trustee 15/12/2020
Raphael Yan Trustee 22/07/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Carol May Becker Trustee 24/11/2023
Richie Poulton Trustee 2/05/2023
Henri Eliot Trustee 14/12/2022
Graham William Henry Trustee 20/05/2022
Jillian Rachael Friedlander Trustee 27/11/2017
Samuel Robert Johnson Trustee 30/06/2016
Peter Wilson Trustee 8/06/2015
Raymond John Avery Chairperson 23/04/2015
Katherine Rich Trustee 11/02/2014
Kaye Crowther Trustee 11/02/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/11/2023 NOC028
26/05/2023 NOC027
3/05/2023 NOC026
25/01/2023 NOC025
15/02/2022 NOC022
30/11/2021 NOC021
12/12/2017 NOC016
29/11/2017 NOC014
23/12/2015 NOC012
1/07/2015 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.