pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Marie Clay Literacy Trust
CC30984
9429043160679
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

11 Belvedere Street
Epsom
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. To promote the literacy learning of the lowest achievers of primary schools in New Zealand. 2. To provide for the continuing development of trained Reading Recovery personnel in New Zealand. 3. To assist and promote international professional exchanges of persons who are involved in Reading Recovery programmes for primary school children and who are also either visiting New Zealand or visiting other countries from New Zealand for the purpose of exchanging or comparing experiences or learning about new developments. 4. To promote or encourage research and study or practice of the teaching of reading. 5. Such other charitable purposes in New Zealand relating to education of children as shall from time to time be determined by Trustees.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors/Research

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Educationalists), Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Registered Charity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
16/10/2020 12/10/2020 $226,177 $170,864
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $167,104 $405,804
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $327,513 $233,846
30/09/2017 2/10/2017 $186,586 $77,796
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $260,981 $157,997
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $299,749 $178,144
30/09/2014 8/10/2014 $192,619 $86,420
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $188,034 $151,130
30/09/2012 1/10/2012 $272,899 $165,844

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rebecca Ngaire Jesson Trustee 11/02/2020
Barbara Watson Trustee 30/06/2008
Graham William McEwan Trustee 30/06/2008
Samuel Stuart McNaughton Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Robert Wilson Irwin Trustee 16/10/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/06/2020 NOC012
27/02/2020 NOC011
1/10/2012 AR005
3/10/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents